U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05081
  • Case Name: Rath v. Sands et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 21, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • April 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Designation of Expert Witness]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 13, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Affidavit]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Discovery Report]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • December 01, 2017: [Crossclaim]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • November 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 16, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.