U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.