U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felicia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 01, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 19, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 15, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 25, 2019: [Furlough]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 06, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 02, 2018: [Produce ]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 24, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 13, 2018: [Furlough]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Suppress]
  • July 03, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 20, 2018: [Jury List]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 07, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 31, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Quash]
  • May 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 24, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Furlough]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Request]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Request]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • October 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Request]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.