U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 29, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 25, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Request]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2017: [Request]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.