U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodshield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 12, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2017: [Request]
  • October 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.