U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50228
  • Case Name: Morgan Paul Russell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule A]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.