U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Condon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • December 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 10, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 17, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 25, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Suppress]
  • December 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Request]
  • October 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2017: [Request]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.