U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knife
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 04, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 20, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 12, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 30, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 28, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Request]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.