U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Request]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 19, 2017: [Request]
  • October 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.