U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Night Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Competency Report]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Competency Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 14, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2017: [Request]
  • October 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.