U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quigley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 09, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 31, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 30, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 01, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 01, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 27, 2017: [Request]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Request]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.