U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sampson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 23, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Compel ]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 18, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Request]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Request]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 03, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.