U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bruguier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 11, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 29, 2021: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 09, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 09, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 15, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 07, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 24, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 24, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 22, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 15, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 22, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 16, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Verdict]
  • November 16, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • November 16, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 15, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • November 15, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Subpoena(s)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 14, 2018: [Jury List]
  • November 14, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 09, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 06, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2018: [Exclude]
  • November 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [In Limine]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Request]
  • October 26, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 25, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 07, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 07, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 17, 2018: [Produce ]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 31, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 27, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.