U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50231
  • Case Name: Frank Paul Ensor and Lynn Janine Catlin-Ensor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Striking Document]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.