U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30075-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ross et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 18, 2022: [Release from Custody]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response]
  • January 12, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice]
  • January 04, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 22, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 01, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Admission]
  • September 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 09, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2019: [Forfeiture]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 08, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Request]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2017: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.