U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04150
  • Case Name: Hansmeyer et al v. Shotkoski et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Case Stay Lifted]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 11, 2019: [Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 01, 2019: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2019: [Counterclaim]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 31, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Form 52 Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 20, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 20, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.