U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10039
  • Case Name: Jesse Paul Skarnagel and Michelle Linn Skarnagel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.