U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01007
  • Case Name: Skarnagel et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 22, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.