U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40497
  • Case Name: Suleiman Hagana Ahmed
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (text entry only)]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order (no notice required)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Correcting Address (no fee)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.