U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50233
  • Case Name: Carol Dereese Woodous
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving/Denying Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Creditor List]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BPP Disclosure of Compensation - B2800]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.