U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-10009-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Little Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • November 03, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 02, 2020: [Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Response]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2020: [Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 08, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.