U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10103
  • Case Name: Wendell Duncan Falk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service Pursuant to LBR 9072-1(b) of Proposed Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulated Facts]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulated Facts]
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
March, 2018
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Creditor(s) Attorney (Text Entry)]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.