U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blacksmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 01, 2020: [Consent]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 18, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 18, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 02, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 06, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 22, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • October 22, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Brief]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 18, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • August 17, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • August 14, 2018: [Brief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 01, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 10, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Suppress]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2017: [Request]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.