U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.