U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 18, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 05, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2017: [Request]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 30, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Request]
  • October 30, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.