U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luis-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.