U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long Soldier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 12, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Request]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.