U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 06, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 07, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2019: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • March 05, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 16, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 31, 2018: [Verdict]
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • May 31, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • May 31, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 31, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 30, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 30, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 30, 2018: [Jury List]
  • May 29, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Request]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2017: [Arrest]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.