U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elbow Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 11, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 13, 2018: [Suppress]
  • February 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.