U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colorado-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Text Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Request]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.