U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trejo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.