U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trejo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Request]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 25, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.