U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10105
  • Case Name: Lance Jason Crooks and Modesta Maestre Crooks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.