U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05084
  • Case Name: Ferrell v. Fitzpatrick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 06, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 06, 2019: [Objection]
  • December 06, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Discovery Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • June 06, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2018: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • May 07, 2018: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Leave to]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 15, 2018: [Consolidate Cases]
  • February 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 04, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 06, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • November 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 03, 2017: [Letter Received]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • October 30, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.