U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50158-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradshaw et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 16, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Furlough]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 19, 2020: [Furlough]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [For Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 04, 2020: [Furlough]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 16, 2020: [In Limine]
  • March 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2020: [In Limine]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2020: [In Limine]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 07, 2020: [Furlough]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 12, 2019: [Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 10, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • October 09, 2019: [Furlough]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 09, 2019: [Furlough]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 20, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 19, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 19, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 19, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 16, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 07, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • June 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 26, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Joinder]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 21, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 22, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Joinder]
  • December 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Reconsideration]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Request]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 02, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 30, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.