U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40516
  • Case Name: Ashley Jordan Schriever
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.