U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50240
  • Case Name: Rolling Hills Farm Investments, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request for Audio of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Show Cause in Lieu of Dismissal]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • November 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.