U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Lodge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2017: [Request]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2017: [Request]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.