U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-01029
  • Case Name: Lundahl v. Roberts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order - Dismissal of Case Under Rule 4(m)]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Electronically File Documents]
  • February 02, 2018: [Electronically File Documents (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 02, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.