U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04153
  • Case Name: Armstrong v. Hudgins
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • November 24, 2017: [Certificate]
  • November 16, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 03, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.