U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 09, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 03, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 12, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 07, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 07, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.