U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Certificate]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response]
  • December 12, 2022: [Supplement]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 11, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Response]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 15, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 22, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 12, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 26, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 26, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 08, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 03, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Response]
  • June 08, 2018: [Request]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2018: [Discovery]
  • April 04, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 03, 2018: [Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 15, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Request]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response]
  • November 15, 2017: [Request]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.