U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vincent
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 22, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Request]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.