U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blanco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2020: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • March 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 28, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 26, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Request]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.