U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aluong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 29, 2019: [Forfeiture]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 01, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 08, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.