U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro-Rubio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2017: [Expedite ]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.