U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04154
  • Case Name: Neilan v. Douglas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Discovery Report]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 07, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.