U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40528
  • Case Name: Brandon Lee Puttmann and Kathleen Marie Puttmann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.