U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corral-Duenas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 04, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2017: [Text Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.