U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40531
  • Case Name: Joshua Lee Sullenger and Chanel Irene Sullenger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Show Cause]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.